EP0905322 - Movable marking means placed on the surface for roadlanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEC ENVEL S.A.R.L. 18, rue Pasteur Veneux les Sablons 77250 Moret sur Loing / FR | [2006/34] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Sec Envel S.à.r.l. 18, rue Pasteur, Veneux les Sablons 77250 Moret-sur-Loing / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupuis, Jean-Claude Frédéric 5, rue du Pavé Neuf 77250 Moret sur Loing / FR | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Schwartz, Thierry J. Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Schwartz, Thierry J. Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/13] | Rataboul, Michel Charles CMR INTERNATIONAL, 10, rue de Florence 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402308.5 | 18.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | FR19970012138 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: FR 9712138 | [1999/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905322 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0905322 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/014, E01F9/093 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
E01F9/594 (EP);
E01F9/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/50] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Umstellbare, auf dem Boden stehende, Verkehrsleiteinrichtung für Fahrspuren | [1999/13] | English: | Movable marking means placed on the surface for roadlanes | [1999/13] | French: | Dispositif amovible de signalisation au sol pour voies de circulation de véhicules | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 01.08.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.12.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2000 | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 20.12.2002 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2003/32] | 15.09.2003 | Resumption of proceedings | [2003/32] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 10.01.2007 | FI | 10.01.2007 | SE | 10.04.2007 | GR | 11.04.2007 | PT | 11.06.2007 | LU | 18.09.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/21] | DK | 10.01.2007 | |
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/15] | DK | 10.01.2007 | |
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4552089 (MAHONEY THOMAS P [US]) [DX] 1-7,9 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2310680 (HOLDSWORTH ROBERT JOHN [GB]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * the whole document *; | [DX]FR2672067 (SODIREL SA [FR]) [DX] 1-3 * page 4, line 15 - page 9, line 28; figure - *; | [DX]DE3905372 (C.H. GUBELA) [DX] 1,2,9 * abstract *; | [X]US4515499 (FURIATE DAVID L [US]) [X] 1,12 * column 5, line 56 - line 63; figure 1 *; | [A]US4080085 (DICKSON ARTHUR D) | by applicant | US4552089 | FR2672067 | DE3905372 |