EP0905982 - Method and device for coding and decoding data, notably sequences of digital images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amonou, Isabelle 10, Rue Louis Guilloux 35235 Thorigne-Fouillard / FR | 02 /
Charrier, Maryline 41, Rue Vasselot 35000 Rennes / FR | 03 /
Dierieck, Claude 2, Place de Sévigné 35510 Cesson Sévigné / FR | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402336.6 | 23.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | FR19970012141 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: FR 9712141 | FR19970012420 | 06.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9712420 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0905982 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0905982 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/36, H04N7/26 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
H04N19/96 (EP);
H04N19/99 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/11] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kodierung und Dekodierung von Daten, insbesondere Digitalbildfolgen | [1999/13] | English: | Method and device for coding and decoding data, notably sequences of digital images | [1999/13] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de codage et de décodage de données, notamment de séquences d'images numériques | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/13] | 28.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4796087 (EUDE GERARD ET AL) [Y] 2-10,22,23,33,36 * abstract *; | [YA]EP0725363 (CANON KK) [Y] 19,20 * abstract * * page 2, line 34 - line 47 * [A] 1; | [XA]EP0749245 (ALCATEL ITALIA ;ALCATEL NV (NL)) [X] 1,21,32,35,51-54,56-59,61 * page 2, line 48 - line 52 * * page 3, line 14 - line 55 * * page 4, line 26 - line 42 * [A] 2-20,22,23,33,34,36,37; | [A]DE3733038 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-23,32-37,51-54,56-59,61 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0720385 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-23,32-37,51-54,56-59,61 * abstract * * column 3, line 21 - line 57 *; | [A]US5563718 (WOBER MUNIB A ET AL) [A] 1-23,32-37,51-54,56-59,61 * abstract * * column 4, line 26 - line 55 *; | [A]US5241395 (CHEN CHENG-TIE) [A] 1-23,32-37,51-54,56-59,61 * abstract *; | [XY] - ANDONOVA S ET AL, "VIDEO CODING USING FRACTAL-BASED IMAGE COMPRESSION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS, SAN ANTONIO, OCT. 2 - 5, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19941002), vol. 1, pages 343 - 348, XP000530699 [X] 1,11-18,21,32,34,35,37,51-54,56-59,61 * the whole document * [Y] 2-10,19,20,22,23,33,36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.1994.399862 | [XA] - GHARAVI-ALKHANSARI M ET AL, "FRACTAL-BASED TECHNIQUES FOR A GENERALIZED IMAGE CODING METHOD", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (IC, AUSTIN, NOV. 13 - 16, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19941113), vol. 3, no. CONF. 1, pages 122 - 126, XP000572262 [X] 1,11-18,21,32,35,51-54,56-59,61 * abstract * * paragraph [02.3] * * paragraph [02.4] * [A] 2-10,19,20,22,23,33,34,36,37 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1994.413875 | [A] - STROBACH P, "QUADTREE-STRUCTURED RECURSIVE PLANE DECOMPOSITION CODING OF IMAGES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (19910601), vol. 39, no. 6, pages 1380 - 1397, XP000235043 [A] 1-23,32-37,51-54,56-59,61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.136544 |