EP0905084 - Apparatus for dispensing liquids, especially beverages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mistral Distribution 2 avenue Ambroise Croizat, Z.I. du Bois de l'Epine 91031 Evry Cédex / FR | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liccioni, Robert 1 rue des Carmes 77150 Lesigny / FR | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Picard, Jean-Claude Georges Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [1999/13] | Application number, filing date | 98402389.5 | 29.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | FR19970012128 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: FR 9712128 | [1999/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905084 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0905084 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B67D3/00 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
B67D3/0009 (EP,KR,US);
B67D3/0029 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/50] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Abgeben von Flüssigkeiten, insbesondere Getränken | [1999/13] | English: | Apparatus for dispensing liquids, especially beverages | [1999/13] | French: | Appareil de distribution de liquides, en particulier de boissons | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5297700 (BURROWS BRUCE D [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 5 *; | [A]WO9418113 (RIVARD DENNIS LAURIER [CA], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,3-5 *; | [A]WO9511194 (ELKAY MFG CO [US]) [A] 1,8* page 10, line 1 - line 6 *; | [A]WO9533165 (SPRINGWELL DISPENSERS INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5611459 (HINCH NOWELL [CA]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5647416 (DESROSIERS ANDRE [CA], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,12 * |