EP0909866 - Wall element made from a profiled frame and insulating glazing with a stepped edge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18, Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2003/26] |
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dirisamer, Wolfgang Keplerstrasse 5 4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
Eckelt, Christian Fischhubweg 14 Steyr / AT | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [1999/16] | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402527.0 | 13.10.1998 | [1999/16] | Priority number, date | DE1997145319 | 14.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19745319 | [1999/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0909866 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0909866 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/54, E06B3/58 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
E06B3/5427 (EP);
E06B3/5409 (EP);
E06B3/5871 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] |
Former [1999/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wandelement aus einem Profilrahmen und einer Isolierverglasung mit Stufenrand | [1999/16] | English: | Wall element made from a profiled frame and insulating glazing with a stepped edge | [1999/16] | French: | Elément de paroi fait d'un châssis en profilés et d'un vitrage isolant à bord en gradin | [1999/16] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 30.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0225473 (ELTREVA AG [CH]) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 5; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]GB2196047 (ELTREVA AG) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2652863 (AUBIN PHILIPPE) [A] 1 * page 4, line 13 - line 38; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0443900 (AUBIN PHILIPPE [FR]) [DA] 1 * column 7, line 40 - column 9, line 19; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0472109 (GARTNER & CO J [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - line 49 * * column 23, line 24 - column 24, line 2; figure 25 *; | [Y]DE4130149 (FISCHL JOSEPH [DE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0628672 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE19642175 (BRUEDER ECKELT & CO GLASTECH [AT]) [PA] 1* column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 6; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0443900 | DE9109232U |