EP0913378 - Process for the dehydrogenation of saturated aliphatic hydrocarbons in olefinic hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Peltier, Fabienne 61, Bis Rue Sophie Rodrigues 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 02 /
Didillon, Blaise 36, Rue Diderot 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 03 /
Clause, Olivier 1, Rue du Chef Saint Jean 78400 Chatou / FR | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Andreeff, François, et al Institut Français du Petrole Patent Division 4 rue de la Paroisse 78400 Chatou / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Andreeff, François, et al Département Brevets, Institut Français du Petrole, 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402677.3 | 27.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | FR19970013685 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9713685 | [1999/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0913378 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913378 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C11/02, C07C5/333, B01J23/62, // (B01J23/62, 103:36, 103:38, 103:66, 103:68) | [1999/18] | CPC: |
B01J23/622 (EP,US);
B01J37/0203 (EP,US);
C07C5/3335 (EP,US);
C07C5/3337 (EP,US);
C10G35/00 (KR);
C07C2523/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C5/3335, C07C11/02 (EP,US);
C07C5/3337, C07C11/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT, NL [2000/03] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Dehydrierung von gesättigten aliphatischen Kohlenwasserstoffen in olefinischen Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1999/18] | English: | Process for the dehydrogenation of saturated aliphatic hydrocarbons in olefinic hydrocarbons | [1999/18] | French: | Procédé de déshydrogénation d'hydrocarbures aliphatiques saturés en hydrocarbures oléfiniques | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 24.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0623385 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1 * claim - * |