EP0919172 - Electric cooking apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | ||
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Moulinex S.A. 2 Rue de l'Industrie 14123 Cormelles le Royal / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bois, Bernard 58, rue Pierre de Coubertin, La Folie Couvrechef 14000 Caen / FR | 02 /
Baillieul, Philippe 6 rue aux Dîmes 14280 ST Germain la Blanche Herbe / FR | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SEB Développement, Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois, B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/22] | Busquets, Jean-Pierre, et al Moulinex S.A., 8, Rue du Colonel Rémy 14052 Caen / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402962.9 | 25.11.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | FR19970015049 | 28.11.1997 Original published format: FR 9715049 | [1999/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0919172 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0919172 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0919172 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/06 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
A47J37/0709 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2000/10] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrisches Gargerät | [1999/22] | English: | Electric cooking apparatus | [1999/22] | French: | Appareil électrique de cuisson | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 30.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 09.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9011038 (BAUDURET AGNES MARIE ODILE [FR]) [Y] 1 * page 5, line 5 - line 16; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3,6-8; | [Y]US5621198 (BETEND-BON ALAIN [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 39 - line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5176067 (HIGGINS DAVID T [US]) [A] 1,6-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - line 53; figure 1 * * column 4, line 29 - line 42 *; | [A]US3527154 (SHAPER CHARLES H, et al) [A] 1,3,6 * column 2, line 37 - line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4862795 (HAWKINS RALPH G [US]) [A] 1,4,7,8 * column 2, line 19 - line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0617909 (MOULINEX SA [FR]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 19; figure 1 *; | [A]DD153518 (ZEMKE HEINZ, et al) [A] 4,5,7 * page 2, line 4 - line 25; figure 2 *; | [A]US3811375 (FRITZSCHE D) [A] 8 * abstract * |