EP0927886 - Method of detecting and characterising hydrocarbons in underground formations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elf Exploration Production Tour Elf, 2 Place de la Coupole, La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1999/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boehm, Claudine 5 rue de Pont Neuf 64800 Beuste / FR | 02 /
Berrut, Jean Bernard 15 rue de Suède 64000 Pau / FR | [1999/27] | Representative(s) | Clisci, Serge, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Clisci, Serge, et al S.A. Fedit--Loriot & Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 38, Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/09] | Clisci, Serge, et al S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRIELLE 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/06] | Boillot, Marc, et al ELF AQUITAINE, Division Propriété Industrielle, Tour Elf 92078 Paris la Défense Cédex 45 / FR | ||
Former [1999/27] | Boillot, Marc ELF AQUITAINE, Division Propriété Industrielle, Tour Elf 92078 Paris la Défense Cédex 45 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98403301.9 | 24.12.1998 | [1999/27] | Priority number, date | FR19970016711 | 30.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9716711 | [1999/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0927886 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0927886 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/28, G01N21/64 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
G01N21/64 (EP,US);
G01N33/241 (EP,US);
G01N2201/129 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [2000/11] |
Former [1999/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Detektion und Charakterisierung von Kohlenwasserstoffen in unterirdischen Lagerstätten | [1999/27] | English: | Method of detecting and characterising hydrocarbons in underground formations | [1999/27] | French: | Procédé de détection et de caractérisation d'hydrocarbures de formation | [1999/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 04.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2142955 (NL PETROLEUM SERVICES) [A] 1-3,7,8 * page 1, line 44 - line 45 * * page 2, paragraph L *; | [A]US4783416 (PATEL JITENDRA G [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 53 - line 62 * * claims 1,3,5 *; | [Y]US4814614 (TSUI TIEN-FUNG [US]) [Y] 1,7 * column 4, line 1 - line 4 * * colonne 4, ligne 60 - colonne 5, * * ligne 6 *; column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0342869 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 5, line 27 - line 43 ** page 5, line 47 - page 6, line 5 *; | [Y]US4959549 (HAUB JOHN G [AU], et al) [Y] 1,7 * column 3, line 54 - line 68 * * column 7, line 47 - line 56 * * column 10, line 4 - line 21 * * figures 3A,3B * |