EP0915480 - Non-volatile MOS memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2001/51] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics SA 7, avenue Gallieni 94250 Gentilly Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Papadas, Constantin 1C, Rue de la Gare 38610 Gieres / FR | 02 /
Schoellkopf, Jean-Pierre 3, Rue Bayard 38000 Grenoble / FR | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [1999/19] | Application number, filing date | 98410119.6 | 16.10.1998 | [1999/19] | Priority number, date | FR19970013317 | 20.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9713317 | [1999/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0915480 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0915480 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0915480 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11C17/16 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
G11C17/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/04] |
Former [1999/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nichtflüchtiger MOS-Speicher | [1999/19] | English: | Non-volatile MOS memory | [1999/19] | French: | Point mémoire MOS | [1999/19] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 29.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.03.2003 | DE | 13.06.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/05] | DE | 13.06.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0712137 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 31 - column 4, line 37 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US4935645 (LEE ROBERT D [US]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 22 - line 45 * * figure 4B *; | [A]US4353083 (TRUDEL MURRAY L, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 53 * * figure 1 * |