EP0918251 - Method of decontaminating a photographic bath with heat-reversible polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poncelet, Olivier Jean Christian, Kodak Industrie Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saone Cedex / FR | 02 /
Wettling, Danielle Marie Henriette, Kodak Ind. Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saone Cedex / FR | 03 /
Rigola, Jeannine, c/o Kodak Industrie Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saone Cedex / FR | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/21] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98420208.5 | 19.11.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | FR19970014742 | 19.11.1997 Original published format: FR 9714742 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0918251 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/395, G03C5/31, G03C7/44 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
G03C5/31 (EP,US);
G03C5/3956 (EP,US);
G03C7/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/05] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Dekontaminierung eines photographischen Bades mit thermoreversiblen Polymeren | [1999/21] | English: | Method of decontaminating a photographic bath with heat-reversible polymers | [1999/21] | French: | Procédé de dépollution d'un bain photographique avec des polymères thermo-reversibles | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 27.11.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 11.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/40] | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.12.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1450588 (HOECHST AG) [X] 1,3,5,7 * page 2, line 26 * * page 2, line 118 - line 119; claim 1 *; | [X]US5219717 (SCHMITTOU ERIC R [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * column 7, line 45 - column 9, line 6; claim 1 *; | [X]US3691086 (LEES RONALD D, et al) [X] 1,5,7 * column 5, line 54 - line 65; claim 1 *; | [Y]US3497467 (COLEMAN LESTER E) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 33 - line 43 * * column 10, line 44 - line 48 * * column 14, line 64 - line 65 * * column 17, line 33 - line 43 * * column 19, line 46 - line 58; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4144373 (WEISS DONALD E, et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 1 - line 11 * * column 2, line 20 - line 25; claims 1,11 *; | [Y]US5432245 (ROBERTS MICHAEL R [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 3, line 17 - line 40 * * column 6, line 38 - line 41 * * column 11, line 45 - line 55; claims 1,3 *; | [Y]FR2033922 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, line 2 - line 9 * * page 12, line 28 - line 34 * |