EP0944272 - Telecommunications exchange with multiple radio base stations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75088 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rousseau, Jean-René 16, allée du Saut du Loup 95000 Neuville sur Oise / FR | 02 /
Riff, Roland 42, rue de général Offenstein 67100 Strassbourg / FR | 03 /
Gruner, Richard 43 route de Kintzheim 67800 Selestat / FR | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/38] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, Dipl.-Ing., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98440055.6 | 18.03.1998 | [1999/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944272 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/00, H04Q7/38 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W84/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/15] |
Former [2000/22] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Telekommunikationsanlage mit mehreren Funkbasisstationen | [1999/38] | English: | Telecommunications exchange with multiple radio base stations | [1999/38] | French: | Central de télécommunication avec plusieurs stations de base radio | [1999/38] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 28.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19645731 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [E] 1-6 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 38; figure - *; | [X]US5673307 (HOLLAND BRUCE M [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 42 - column 12, line 65; figure - *; | [XA]EP0785694 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, column 5, line 5 - page 7, column 12, line 9; figure - * [A] 3-6; | [X]WO9631078 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 17 - page 12, line 36; figure - *; | [X]WO9715160 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 10, line 20 - page 19, line 30; figure - *; | [A]GB2296632 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 6, line 5 - page 9, line 19; figure - *; | [A]WO9625015 (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 8, line 18 - page 14, line 36; figure - *; | [A]EP0618745 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, column 2, line 17 - page 4, column 5, line 22 * |