EP0882611 - Apparatus for converting a cabriolet of targa type into a roadster type and the reverse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states This, Jérôme 20, rue du Vau Méno, BP 7069 22070 Saint-Brieux Cedex 03 / FR | [1998/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Patrice Vidon, Immeuble Germanium, 80, Avenue des Buttes-de-Coesmes 35700 Rennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 98460020.5 | 03.06.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | FR19970007074 | 03.06.1997 Original published format: FR 9707074 | [1998/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0882611 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/08, B60J7/20 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
B60J7/1657 (EP);
B60J7/08 (EP);
B60J7/10 (EP);
B60J7/20 (EP);
B62D47/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1999/33] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Umwandeln eines Cabriolet-Fahrzeuges von Targa zum Roadster und umgekehrt | [1998/50] | English: | Apparatus for converting a cabriolet of targa type into a roadster type and the reverse | [1998/50] | French: | Dispositif de transformation d'un cabriolet en configuration "coupé targa" en un cabriolet en configuration "roadster" et inversement | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/08] | 30.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0482681 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 30; figure - *; | [X]GB2240519 (C & C INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * page 6, line 25 - page 16, line 9; figure - *; | [X]DE3721895 (SCHWARTZ HELMA [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 7; figure - *; | [A]CH650980 (PAUL ROLLMAN); | [A]DE8512489U (KAISER); | [A]DE4438190 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]FR2694245 (FRANCE DESIGN [FR]) |