EP0887804 - Read method and circuit for dynamic memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | [1999/05] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrant, Richard Cabinet Ballot Schmit, 18 Place du Forum 57000 Metz / FR | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques Cabinet Ballot 9 rue Claude Chappé 57070 Metz / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 18, Place du Forum 57000 Metz / FR | Application number, filing date | 98470013.8 | 03.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | FR19970007809 | 19.06.1997 Original published format: FR 9707809 | [1999/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0887804 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887804 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/409, G11C7/06 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
G11C11/4091 (EP,US);
G11C7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/36] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Leseverfahren und Schaltung für dynamischen Speicher | [1999/01] | English: | Read method and circuit for dynamic memory | [1999/01] | French: | Procédé et circuit de lecture pour mémoire dynamique | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 04.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 17.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.07.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4634901 (MCELROY DAVID J [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5319589 (YAMAGATA TADATO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, line 16 - column 10, line 60; figures 3-8 *; | [A]US5323349 (HAMADE KEI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 7, line 1 - column 10, line 23; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5353255 (KOMURO TOSHIO) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 41 - column 6, line 49; figures 1-3 * | Examination | US5406148 |