EP0957206 - A modular separating barrier element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Construcciones Mecanicas Mares, S.A. Poligono Industrial La Ferreria, Calle Quimica 14 08110 Montcada i Reixac (Barcelona) / ES | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mares Ibanez, Pere Calle Quimica 14, Pol. Ind. La Ferreria 08110 Montcada i Reixac (Barcelona) / ES | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Höhfeld, Jochen Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Höhfeld, Jochen Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | Durán Olivella, Alfonso DURAN-CORRETJER, S.L., Paseo de Gracia, 101 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 98500237.7 | 29.10.1998 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | ES19980000987 | 12.05.1998 Original published format: ES 9800987 | [1999/46] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0957206 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0957206 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E01F13/02 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
E01F13/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT [2000/30] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ein modulares Leitplankensystemelement | [1999/46] | English: | A modular separating barrier element | [1999/46] | French: | Un élément de glissière modulaire de séparation | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 18.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, IE, LU, MC, SE | 23.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.2004
13.05.2004
ADMISSIBLE Adolf Nissen Elektrobau GmbH & Co. KG Friedrichstädter Chaussee 4 D-25832 Tönning / DE Opponent's representative Tönnies, Jan G., et al, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwàlte Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.2004
Adolf Nissen Elektrobau GmbH & Co. KG Friedrichstädter-Chaussee 4 D-2253 Tönning / DE Opponent's representative Tönnies, Jan G., et al, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | 03.05.2004 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 07.05.2004 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 11.02.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.06.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.05.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.06.2008 | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.03.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.06.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2004 | BE | 07.04.2004 | CH | 07.04.2004 | IT | 07.04.2004 | LI | 07.04.2004 | NL | 07.04.2004 | GR | 07.07.2004 | PT | 07.09.2004 | GB | 29.10.2008 | ES | 30.10.2008 | FR | 31.10.2008 | [2020/33] |
Former [2010/05] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
IT | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
PT | 07.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2008/15] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
IT | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
PT | 07.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0120795 (SAMIA STE FSE [FR]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11 * page 5, line 3 - line 17; figure - *; | [A]FR2704879 (DAVANTURE GILLES [FR]) [A] 1,2,5,8,9,11* page 1, line 14 - line 28; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US5544614 (CUSHMAN VERONICA B [US]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 29 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 59; figures 11,17 * |