EP0863083 - Container for storage and transport of goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/37] | Container for storage and transport of goods and elements for construction of such a container | ||
[2002/19] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danboren A/S Klokkestobervej 3-5 8800 Viborg / DK | [1998/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jörgensen, Ole Pless Kiderisvej 16 7400 Herning / DK | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Elmeros, Claus, et al Hofman-Bang & Boutard Lehmann & Ree A/S Ryesgade 3 P.O. Box 367 8100 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Elmeros, Claus, et al Hofman-Bang & Boutard, Lehmann & Ree A/S Ryesgade 3 P.O. Box 367 8100 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 98610005.5 | 05.03.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | DK19970000240 | 06.03.1997 Original published format: DK 24097 | DK19970000647 | 02.06.1997 Original published format: DK 64797 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863083 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/12, B65D19/38 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
B65D19/385 (EP);
B65D19/12 (EP);
B65D2519/00029 (EP);
B65D2519/00064 (EP);
B65D2519/00164 (EP);
B65D2519/00233 (EP);
B65D2519/00512 (EP);
B65D2519/00606 (EP);
B65D2519/00676 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/21] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lager- und Transportbehälter für Waren | [2002/19] | English: | Container for storage and transport of goods | [2002/19] | French: | Conteneur de stockage et de transport de marchandises | [2002/19] |
Former [1998/37] | Lager- und Transportbehälter für Waren, sowie Bauteile für einen solchen Behälter | ||
Former [1998/37] | Container for storage and transport of goods and elements for construction of such a container | ||
Former [1998/37] | Conteneur de stockage et de transport de marchandises et éléments pour la construction d'un tel conteneur | Examination procedure | 15.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 10.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU, MC | 29.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/18] | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/18] | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.04.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.2000 | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2377542 (AMROGOWICZ) [X] 1,2,7,10,12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB975851 (FINSPA ENGINEERING) [A] 1,3-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE7732613U (ASPA-FÖRDERGERÄTE) [A] 1,3-6 * figure - *; | [A]NL9500208 (PASINI & CIA) [A] 1,2 * figures 7,8 *; | [A]FR2317174 (ATELIERS REUNIS) [A] 1,2,8-12 * the whole document * |