EP0880091 - A method and an arrangement for scrolling information presented on a display of a mobile station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Korhonen, Panu Albertinkatu 44 A 58 00180 Helsinki / FI | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Levlin, Jan Markus Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Levlin, Jan Markus Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98660047.6 | 19.05.1998 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | FI19970002159 | 21.05.1997 Original published format: FI 972159 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0880091 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0880091 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0880091 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, H04B1/38, H04M1/274, H04M1/00 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/0485 (EP);
H04M1/72469 (EP);
H04M1/2747 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/48] | G06F3/033, H04B1/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2000/47] |
Former [1998/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Informationsverschiebung einer Anzeige in einer Mobilfunkstation | [1998/48] | English: | A method and an arrangement for scrolling information presented on a display of a mobile station | [1998/48] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour faire défiler des informations présentées à l'affichage d'une station mobile | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4954967 (TAKAHASHI HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,11-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-7 * [Y] 4-10,15-17; | [Y]WO9514964 (ROCA PRODUCTIONS INC [US]) [Y] 8,15,16 * abstract * * page 8, lines 24-27 * * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 13 * * page 12, line 33 - page 13, line 3 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9525397 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [Y] 9,10,17 * abstract * * page 25, lines 11-21 * * figure 4 *; | [Y]US5495566 (KWATINETZ ANDREW [US]) [Y] 4-7 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - column 10, line 58 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0721272 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 44 * * column 4, lines 21-25 ** figures 1-3 *; | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Window Scrolling without Scroll Bars", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, New York, US, (199310), vol. 36, no. 10, pages 137 - 138, XP000412209 [X] 1,13,15 * the whole document * | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Three-Dimensional Selection Widget", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, New York, US, (199502), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 423 - 424, XP000502528 [X] 1,9-15,17 * the whole document * |