EP0893901 - Method for controlling a telecommunication service and a terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ali-Yrkkö, Olli Ahvenisraitti 19 B 24 33720 Tampere / FI | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98660072.4 | 22.07.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | FI19970003093 | 23.07.1997 Original published format: FI 973093 | [1999/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0893901 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0893901 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0893901 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/27 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
H04M1/271 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/08] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Telekommunikationsdienst und eines Endgerät | [1999/04] | English: | Method for controlling a telecommunication service and a terminal | [1999/04] | French: | Méthode de contrôle d'un service de télécommunication et d'un terminal | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 05.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.09.2005 | [2008/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9712361 (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,6,7,9 * abstract * * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 8 * * page 4, line 3 - line 15; figure 1 * * page 8, line 7 - line 10; claims 1,9 * [A] 4,5; | [Y]JPH0213166 ; | [A]US5402477 (MCMAHAN MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 23; figure 1A * * column 4, line 11 - line 18 *; | [A]US4737976 (BORTH DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 6-9 * abstract *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900323), vol. 014, no. 154, Database accession no. (E - 0907), & JP02013166 A 19900117 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 1-3,6,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - FLORKEY C ET AL, "JUST SAY THE WORD FOR SERVICE", AT & T TECHNOLOGY, AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH CO. SHORT HILLS, NEW JERSEY, US, (19940321), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 0889-8979, pages 4 - 9, XP000458380 [A] * page 6 - page 7 * | [A] - IMMENDORFER M, "APPLICATIONS FOR SPEECH PROCESSING IN TELECOMMUNICATION AND OFFICE EQUIPMENT", ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION, ALCATEL. BRUSSELS, BE, (1986), vol. 1, no. 60, ISSN 0013-4252, pages 71 - 78, XP002071013 [A] * the whole document * |