EP0899374 - Method of producing a bleached pulp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OJI PAPER CO., LTD. 7-5, Ginza 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states OJI PAPER CO., LTD. 7-5, Ginza 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchida, Yosuke 1-18-13-402, Honmachi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Miura, Takahiro 1-13-26, Kitashinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Iwasaki, Makoto 3-24-8-209, Nakamachi, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Risku, Ira Marjatta Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Risku, Ira Marjatta Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98660084.9 | 28.08.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | JP19970235829 | 01.09.1997 Original published format: JP 23582997 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0899374 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/14, D21C9/10 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
D21C9/14 (EP,US);
D21C9/1026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines gebleichten Zellstoffs | [1999/09] | English: | Method of producing a bleached pulp | [1999/09] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une pâte à papier blanchie | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 25.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9315263 (OLIN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 7, line 4 - line 15 * * page 8, line 23 - line 28 * * page 16, line 27 - page 19, line 15 *; | [PA]WO9800602 (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR IND AB [SE], et al) [PA] 1,6,8* the whole document * |