EP0933961 - A method and arrangement for locating a mobile station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruutu, Ville Uudenkaupungintie 5 B 14 00350 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Rantalainen, Timo Meripuistotie 4 A 7 00200 Helsinki / FI | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Levlin, Jan Markus Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Levlin, Jan Markus Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98660112.8 | 04.11.1998 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | FI19970004153 | 06.11.1997 Original published format: FI 974153 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933961 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933961 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933961 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/22 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/41] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Standorterfassung einer mobilen Station | [1999/31] | English: | A method and arrangement for locating a mobile station | [1999/31] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de localisation d'une station mobile | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 05.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9601531 (KARBASI AMIR KIUMARS [FI], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 1, line 4 - page 6, line 8 *; | [XA]EP0484918 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1-3,13,19 * column 1, line 3 - column 4, line 26 * [A] 14,16; | [A]US4728959 (MALONEY JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 3,7 * column 2, line 11 - line 15; figure 1 * | Examination | US5365516 |