EP0864764 - Fastening element for connecting two mutually perpendicular hollow profile bars and frame with such hollow profile bars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBERIT TECHNIK AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states GEBERIT TECHNIK AG Schachenstrasse 77 CH-8645 Jona / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egli, Anton Hauptstrasse 27 8739 Rieden / CH | 02 /
Gut, René Donnerweidstrasse 2 8855 Wangen / CH | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810089.7 | 09.02.1998 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | CH19970000593 | 12.03.1997 Original published format: CH 59397 | [1998/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0864764 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0864764 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
F16B7/0473 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, IT, LI, NL [2000/03] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbinder zum Verbinden von zwei quer zueinander verlaufenden Hohlprofilstangen sowie Gestell mit solchen Hohlprofilstangen | [1998/38] | English: | Fastening element for connecting two mutually perpendicular hollow profile bars and frame with such hollow profile bars | [1998/38] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour connecter deux barres profilées creuses mutuellement perpendiculaires et structure comportant de telles barres profilées creuses | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 09.11.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 03.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/14] | 14.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.12.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.12.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.12.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.12.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.12.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.12.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.12.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.12.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.12.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0675292 (GEBERIT TECHNIK AG [CH]) [DA] 1-3,5-11,14 * page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 51; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0592743 (RAPID SA [FR]) [A] 1,7,11,14 * column 2, line 22 - column 4, line 1; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2721377 (ALUGRIP [FR]) [A] 1,7,11,14 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 22; figures 1-9 * | by applicant | EP0675292 |