EP0902615 - Electronic component with shielding sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELMA Electronic AG Hofstrasse 93 8620 Wetzikon / CH | [1999/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schindler, Walter A. Gerenholzstrasse 20 8055 Zürich / CH | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Sulzer Management AG KS / Patente / 0007, Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810165.5 | 27.02.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | DE1997215114U | 22.08.1997 Original published format: DE 29715114 U | [1999/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0902615 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902615 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
H05K9/0016 (EP,US);
H02B1/30 (EP,US);
H02B1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Baugruppenträger mit Abschirmblechen | [1999/11] | English: | Electronic component with shielding sheets | [1999/11] | French: | Composant électronique avec tôles de blindage | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 18.09.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 29.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.12.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.12.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5436802 (TRAHAN DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [E]EP0828411 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [E] 1* the whole document * |