EP0959020 - Packaging enabling manipulation security [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcan Technology & Management AG Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2001/46] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Alusuisse Technology & Management AG 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerber, Manfred Reichenaustrasse 23 78224 Singen / DE | [1999/47] | Application number, filing date | 98810471.7 | 20.05.1998 | [1999/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959020 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/34, B32B7/06 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
B32B7/06 (EP);
B65D75/327 (EP);
B65D2575/3245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/47] | Title | German: | Manipulationssichere Verpackung | [1999/47] | English: | Packaging enabling manipulation security | [1999/47] | French: | Emballage permettant la sécurité lors de manipulations | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 10.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3899080 (BRUNDA MICHAEL J) [X] 1,4,6,7 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 17 *; | [X]US4169531 (WOOD CLIFFORD A) [X] 1,7 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 12 *; | [A]US3921805 (COMPERE NEWTON L) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 49 - page 5, line 33 * * column 6, line 24 - line 67; figure - *; | [A]US5172812 (WHARTON B G ET AL) [A] 1-8 * claim - * * column 4, line 2 - line 21 *; | [A]EP0771737 (MCNEIL PPC INC) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0671432 (BP CHEMICALS PLASTEC GMBH ;DANUBIA PETROCHEM POLYMERE (AT)) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0613832 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29607107U (ZUBER WOLFGANG) [A] 8 * the whole document * |