EP0888726 - Pocket knife [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WENGER S.A. Route de Bâle 63 CH-2800 Delémont / CH | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cachot, Maurice Semailles 1 2800 Delémont / CH | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810503.7 | 02.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | CH19970001584 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: CH 158497 | [1999/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888726 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888726 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A24F13/26, B26B11/00 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
A24F13/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Extension states | RO | 29.04.1999 | SI | 29.04.1999 | Title | German: | Taschenmesser | [1999/01] | English: | Pocket knife | [1999/01] | French: | Couteau de poche | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 02.05.2002 | NL | 02.05.2002 | LU | 02.06.2002 | MC | 02.06.2002 | BE | 30.06.2002 | CY | 30.06.2002 | DK | 02.08.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/10] | GR | 02.05.2002 | |
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
MC | 02.06.2002 | ||
BE | 30.06.2002 | ||
CY | 30.06.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | GR | 02.05.2002 | |
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
MC | 02.06.2002 | ||
BE | 30.06.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 02.05.2002 | |
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
MC | 02.06.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | GR | 02.05.2002 | |
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
MC | 02.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 02.05.2002 | |
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 02.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE22051 (HALBEKANN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE25866 (PRINZ) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR418164 (CHARLES STIEBER [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US1454994 (DE MATTEO LEWIS) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US1717925 (CARL HORIX); | [A]DE2250788 (WENGER S.A.) [A] 3-5 * the whole document * |