EP0962586 - Process for improving the photochemical and thermal stability of dyeings and printings of polyester fibrous materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freudenreich, Charles 16, rue des sapins 68400 Riedisheim / FR | [1999/49] | Application number, filing date | 98810516.9 | 05.06.1998 | [1999/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962586 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06P1/642, D06P5/06 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
D06P5/06 (EP);
D06P1/6426 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbesserung der photochemischen und thermischen Stabilität von Färbungen und Drucken auf Polyesterfasermaterialien | [1999/49] | English: | Process for improving the photochemical and thermal stability of dyeings and printings of polyester fibrous materials | [1999/49] | French: | Procédé pour améliorer la stabilité photochimique et thermique des teintures et des impressions des matériaux fibreux en polyester | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1386624 (CIBA SOCIÉTÉ ANONYME) [X] 1-5 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 4, column 1, paragraph A - page 5, column 1, paragraph 1; example 7; claim - *; | [Y]EP0584044 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0795640 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [Y] 1-5 * claim - * |