EP0894877 - Dirt removing apparatus for fiber cleaning aggregates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waeber, René Zielstrasse 79 8400 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Schlepfer, Walter Stationsstrasse 3 8406 Winterthur / CH | 03 /
Näf, Beat Rebackerstrasse 18a 8645 Jona / CH | 04 /
Sauter, Christian Lahmerstrasse 10 8247 Flurlingen / CH | 05 /
Faas, Jürg Oberkahnenstrasse 13 8450 Andelfingen / CH | [1999/05] | Application number, filing date | 98810687.8 | 16.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | CH19970001819 | 30.07.1997 Original published format: CH 181997 | CH19970001972 | 22.08.1997 Original published format: CH 197297 | DE1998210665U | 13.06.1998 Original published format: DE 29810665 U | DE1998210964U | 19.06.1998 Original published format: DE 29810964 U | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894877 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894877 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/80, D01G23/02 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
D01G15/24 (EP);
D01G15/805 (EP);
D01G23/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [2000/52] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schmutzausscheidevorrichtung für Faserreinigungsaggregate | [1999/05] | English: | Dirt removing apparatus for fiber cleaning aggregates | [1999/05] | French: | Appareil d'extraction de souillure pour agregats de nettoyage de fibres | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/50] | Request for further processing for: | 04.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0423856 (FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.P.A.) [Y] 1-5,7-10,14,15,19 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 9; figure 1; claims 1-6 *; | [Y]WO9319232 (MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG) [Y] 1-5,7-10,14,15,19 * page 6 - page 13; figures 2-4,9,11; claims 1,10,12 *; | [AD]EP0481302 (MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG) [AD] 1,3,5,7,8,10,19 * the whole document * |