EP0973008 - Electronical micrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.01.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2010 | New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TESA SA Rue du Bugnon 38 1020 Renens / CH | [2003/24] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states Brown & Sharpe Tesa S.A. Rue Bugnon 38 1020 Renens / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zanier, Adriano Avenue des Huttins 9 1008 Prilly / CH | 02 /
Bortgognon, Lucien Rue des Uttins 12 bis 1110 Morges / CH | 03 /
Bovey, Arthur Avenue Ruchonnet 51 1003 Lausanne / CH | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | P&TS Patents & Technology Surveys SA Case Postale 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2007/48] | P&TS Patents & Technology Surveys SA Terreaux 7 P.O.Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2000/03] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810690.2 | 17.07.1998 | [2000/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973008 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973008 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01B3/18 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
G01B3/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/39] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronisches Mikrometer | [2000/03] | English: | Electronical micrometer | [2000/03] | French: | Micromètre électronique | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 20.07.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.2004
Mahr GmbH Postfach 18 53 37008 Göttingen / DE Opponent's representative Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | 02
19.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-Chome Takatsu-Ku, Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP Opponent's representative Koch, Jens Christian, et al, et al Grünecker, Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.2004
Mahr GmbH Postfach 18 53 37008 Göttingen / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | ||
02
19.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-Chome Takatsu-Ku, Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP Opponent's representative Koch, Jens Christian, et al, et al Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2004/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE Mahr GmbH Postfach 18 53 37008 Göttingen / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | 01.10.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.04.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.04.2005 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M05) | 06.10.2005 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.10.2009 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/08] | 13.10.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 11.04.2007 | Appeal received No. T0605/07 | 28.06.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.10.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 13.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07159102 ; | [A]US3971137 (FERNANDEZ PABLO MARTINEZ) [A] 1 * column 2 - column 3 *; | [A]US5288292 (GIRAUD CLARENCE E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4 - column 7 *; | [AD]US5433016 (TACHIKAKE MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-17 * column 5 - column 11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07159102 A 19950623 (MITSUTOYO CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |