EP0895052 - Magazine locking device on a pistol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A.T. Swiss Arms Technology AG Baarerstrasse 12 6300 Zug / CH | [2001/28] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states SIG Arms International AG 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rost, Sebastian Benkemergässli 14 8447 Dachsen / CH | 02 /
Rutz, Marcel Reckholdernweg 18 8422 Pfungen / CH | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Münch, Otto, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2008/44] |
Former [1999/05] | Münch, Otto, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810698.5 | 20.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | DE1997132656 | 29.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19732656 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895052 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895052 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895052 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F41A17/38 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
F41A35/06 (EP,US);
F41A17/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/15] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magazinhalter an einer Pistole | [1999/05] | English: | Magazine locking device on a pistol | [1999/05] | French: | Arrêtoir pour chargeur sur un pistolet | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 05.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 19.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) NL | 05.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2003/21] | FR | 25.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1397109 (PEDERSEN JOHN D) [X] 2 * page 2, column L, line 37 - column R, line 94; figures 3-7 *; | [AD]DE2845121 (BERETTA ARMI SPA); | [XA]DE3414328 (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG [AT]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [A] 5,6; | [AD]EP0364408 (BERETTA ARMI SPA [IT]) [AD] 2 * abstract * | by applicant | DE2845121 | EP0364408 |