EP0895129 - Image formation method using electrophotography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA CORPORATION 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozawa, Yoshio c/o Kyocera Corp., 14-9, Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mukataka, Hisahi c/o Kyocera Corp., Mie Factory, 704-19 Aza Matabei Nojino, Tamaki-cho, Watarai-gun, Mie / JP | 03 /
Sato, Yojiro c/o Kyocera Corp., Mie Factory, 704-19 Aza Matabei Nojino, Tamaki-cho, Watarai-gun, Mie / JP | 04 /
Kamiyama, Yuji c/o Kyocera Corp., Mie Factory, 704-19 Aza Matabei Nojino, Tamaki-cho, Watarai-gun, Mie / JP | 05 /
Moriguchi, Motoki c/o Kyocera Corp., Mie Factory, 704-19 Aza Matabei Nojino, Tamaki-cho, Watarai-gun, Mie / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Liebetanz, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810724.9 | 28.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | JP19970219989 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: JP 21998997 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895129 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895129 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895129 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/06, G03G9/097 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
G03G15/751 (EP,US);
G03G5/0564 (EP,US);
G03G5/06 (EP,US);
G03G5/14704 (EP,US);
G03G9/097 (EP,US);
G03G9/09708 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/47] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches Bildherstellungsverfahren | [1999/05] | English: | Image formation method using electrophotography | [1999/05] | French: | Méthode pour former une image electrophotographique | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 19.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0614129 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * page 2, line 40 - line 54 * * page 3, line 46 - line 48 *; | [A]EP0713150 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-19 * page 31; example 4 * * page 32; table 5 *; | [A]EP0340523 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-19 * page 2, line 39 - line 52 *; | [A]EP0570886 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8-16 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP0555102 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,17-19 * page 6, line 32 - line 36 * * page 6, line 37 - page 8, line 14 *; | [A]JPH09190125 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 39, Database accession no. 97-421762, XP002090253 & JPH09190125 A 19970722 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1-19 * abstract * |