EP0987074 - Apparatus for the forming or forging of blanks, elements or workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SM Schweizerische Munitionsunternehmung AG Allmendstrasse 74 3602 Thun / CH | [2000/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuler, Walter Löwenmaltweg 27 CH-6460 Altdorf / CH | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Frauenknecht, Alois J., et al PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG Waldrütistrasse 21 8954 Geroldswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Frauenknecht, Alois J., et al c/o PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG, Waldrütistrasse 21 8954 Geroldswil / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810935.1 | 18.09.1998 | [2000/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987074 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B22D18/02, B21J5/02 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
B21J5/02 (EP);
B22D18/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, LI | ||
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Umformen oder Schmieden von Rohlingen, Bauteilen oder Werkstücken | [2000/12] | English: | Apparatus for the forming or forging of blanks, elements or workpieces | [2000/12] | French: | Dispositif de formage ou forgeage d'ébauches, d'éléments ou de pièces | [2000/12] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 03.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.10.2000 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | 19.10.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | 19.10.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | 19.10.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | 19.10.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | 19.10.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | 19.10.2000 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | 19.10.2000 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | 19.10.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | 19.10.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | 19.10.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE633209 (FRASER-JONES) [Y] 1-4,7,14 * page 2, line 1 - line 28 * * page 2, line 60 - line 80; figure - * [A] 5,6,15; | [Y]WO9533586 (LUCAS IND PLC ;ANDERSON PETER ROBINSON GUILDF (GB); MUDWAY JOHN AN) [Y] 1-4,7,14 * page 5, line 4 - line 12 * * page 6, line 1 - line 6; figure - *; | [A]EP0531002 (RHEO TECHNOLOGY LTD) [A] 1 * column 5, line 11 - line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4687042 (YOUNG KENNETH P) [A] 1 * column 4, line 3 - line 22; figure - *; | [A]US3068539 (WILCOXON) [A] 1-5,7,11,14,15 * column 4, line 68 - column 5, line 2; figure - *; | [A]US5475999 (SEKIGUCHI TSUNEHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,6,7,11,14,15 * column 14, line 65 - column 15, line 15; figure - * |