EP0990610 - Device for depositing folded sheet on a conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAPHA-HOLDING AG Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states GRAPHA-HOLDING AG Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sägesser, Christoph Langmatt 2 5506 Mägenwil / CH | [2000/14] | Application number, filing date | 98810972.4 | 28.09.1998 | [2000/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990610 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990610 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/30 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
B65H5/307 (EP,US);
B65H5/14 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4492 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4531 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/50] |
Former [2000/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ablegen von gefalzten Bogen auf eine Transportvorrichtung | [2000/14] | English: | Device for depositing folded sheet on a conveyor | [2000/14] | French: | Dispositif pour déposer des feuilles pliées sur un transporteur | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]CH408065 (MUELLER HANS [CH]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2228230 (MUELLER HANS GRAPHA MASCH) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 22 - page 7, line 15; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4358100 (MUELLER HANS) [A] 1* column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 16; figures 1-3 * |