EP0915128 - Silicone foams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andresen, Arndt Schwifting Strasse 1D 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | 02 /
Bertsch, Thorsten Kappellenweg 6 86946 Mundraching / DE | 03 /
Rump, Stefan von-Eichdorff-Strasse 33 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | 04 /
Münzenberger, Herbert Schultheiss-Strasse 8A 65191 Wiesbaden / DE | 05 /
Heimpel, Franz Schmiedbergweg 7b 86444 Affing / DE | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 98811020.1 | 13.10.1998 | [1999/19] | Priority number, date | DE19971049660 | 10.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19749660 | [1999/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0915128 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/14, C08J9/02, // C08L83/04 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
C08J9/146 (EP);
C08L83/00 (KR);
C08J9/02 (EP);
C08J9/04 (KR);
C08J9/14 (EP);
C08J9/141 (KR);
C08J2383/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2000/03] |
Former [1999/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Silicon-Schaummassen | [1999/19] | English: | Silicone foams | [1999/19] | French: | Mousse de silicone | [1999/19] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/30] | 03.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.12.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.12.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4550125 (LEE CHI-LONG [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 43 * * column 9, line 30 - line 54 * * column 10, line 10 - line 22 * * example 3 *; | [X]US4593049 (BAUMAN THERESE M [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 51 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 35 * * example 5 *; | [X]US5246974 (JONAS REINHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 43 - line 45 * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 8 * * column 2, line 23 - line 35 * |