EP0923061 - Method and device for automatically displaying the probable waiting time until the arrival of the next vehicle at public transport stops [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precimation AG Erlenstrasse 35A 2555 Brügg b. Biel / CH | [1999/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenz, Daniel Trappelen 10 3294 Büren an der Aare / CH | 02 /
Siegenthaler, Peter Seerain 27 2572 Mörigen / CH | [2002/30] |
Former [2002/22] | 01 /
Lenz, Daniel Trappeten 10 3294 Büren an der Aare / CH | ||
02 /
Siegenthaler, Peter Seerain 27 2572 Mörigen / CH | |||
Former [1999/24] | 01 /
Lenz, Daniel Trappelen 10 3294 Büren an der Aare / CH | ||
02 /
Siegenthaler, Peter Seerain 27 2572 Mörigen / CH | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 98811201.7 | 04.12.1998 | [1999/24] | Priority number, date | CH19970002870 | 12.12.1997 Original published format: CH 287097 | [1999/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923061 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923061 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/123 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
G08G1/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/24] | Extension states | LT | 24.11.1999 | LV | 24.11.1999 | RO | 24.11.1999 | SI | 24.11.1999 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum automatischen Anzeigen der voraussichtlich bis zur Ankunft des nächsten Fahrzeuges verbleibenden Zeit an Haltestellen eines Verkehrsmittel | [1999/24] | English: | Method and device for automatically displaying the probable waiting time until the arrival of the next vehicle at public transport stops | [1999/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'affichage automatique du temps probable restant avant l'arrivée du véhicule suivant aux arrêts d'un transport publique | [1999/24] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 26.07.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.07.2002 | GR | 24.07.2002 | IE | 24.07.2002 | IT | 24.07.2002 | DK | 24.10.2002 | PT | 24.10.2002 | SE | 24.10.2002 | LU | 04.12.2002 | CY | 31.12.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2005/21] | FI | 24.07.2002 | |
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
IE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
LU | 04.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | GR | 24.07.2002 | |
IE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
LU | 04.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | GR | 24.07.2002 | |
IE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GR | 24.07.2002 | |
IE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 24.07.2002 | |
IE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | GR | 24.07.2002 | |
IE | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 24.07.2002 | |
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 24.07.2002 | |
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 24.10.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2388357 (ELECTRONIQUE VEHICULES RESEAUX [FR]); | [A]EP0219859 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]DE3834710 (ZIEGLER HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 2,3,7-9 * claim - *; | [A]FR2648938 (SOCAVEL STE AVIONNAISE ELECTRO [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9313510 (MURDOCH WIGHT LIMITED J [GB]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9402923 (DECAUX JEAN CLAUDE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9402922 (DECAUX JEAN CLAUDE [FR], et al) [Y] 1 * claim - *; | [A]DE19515809 (RONKHOLZ KARL HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-3,7-9 * claim - * |