EP0867667 - Oil radiator equipped with heat exchanger for the production of hot water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laminox - S.r.l. Località Gabella Nuova 252, Zona Industriale 62028 Sarnano (MC) / IT | [1998/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arra, Giuseppe Via G. Puccini, 50 Sarnano (MC) / IT | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | [1998/40] | Application number, filing date | 98830121.4 | 06.03.1998 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | IT1997AN00012U | 21.03.1997 Original published format: IT AN970012 U | [1998/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0867667 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0867667 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F24H6/00 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
F24H6/00 (EP);
F24H1/48 (EP);
F24H3/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [2001/03] |
Former [1998/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ölheizkörper mit Wärmetauscher zur Brauchwasserbereitung | [1998/40] | English: | Oil radiator equipped with heat exchanger for the production of hot water | [1998/40] | French: | Radiateur à huile avec échangeur de chaleur pour la production d'eau chaude sanitaire | [1998/40] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0482494 (OMAS SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0040037 (BROWN RONALD JAMES) |