EP0941739 - Porous coated artificial implant material and corresponding preparation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bravo, Carlos Calle 17, N. 1438 Armenia / CO | For all designated states Mannino, Enzo Via Liberta, 193 40193 Palermo / IT | [1999/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/34] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/33] | De Nova, Roberto, et al Jacobacci & Perani, Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1999/37] | De Nova, Roberto, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830131.3 | 10.03.1998 | [1999/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941739 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
D04C1/06 (EP);
A61L27/18 (EP);
A61L27/34 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L67/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU [2000/21] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Poröses, künstliches beschichtetes Implantatmaterial und Verfahren zu seiner Hertellung | [1999/37] | English: | Porous coated artificial implant material and corresponding preparation process | [1999/37] | French: | Matériau pour implant artificiel, revêtu et procédé pour sa préparation | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.04.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2000 | 31.03.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2001 | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0328421 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [Y] 1-8,13-21 * page 4, line 10 - line 45 * * page 9, line 59 - page 10, line 65 * * example 5 * * claims 1,2,11,15,21-23 *; | [Y]DE3913926 (WERNER HEINZ HELMUT DR MED [DE]) [Y] 1-8,13-21 * column 1, line 3 - line 26 ** claims 1-5 * |