EP0947729 - Worm-helical gear reducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BONFIGLIOLI RIDUTTORI S.p.A. Via Giovanni XXIII, 7/a I-40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno / IT | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cognigni, Enzo Via Francesco Barbieri, 51/2 40129 Bologna / IT | 02 /
Depietri, Pietro Via Atti, 2 40141 Bologna / IT | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830201.4 | 02.04.1998 | [1999/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0947729 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947729 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/16 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
F16H57/025 (EP);
F16H1/16 (EP);
F16H2057/0213 (EP);
F16H57/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/24] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schneckenreduktionsgetriebe | [1999/40] | English: | Worm-helical gear reducer | [1999/40] | French: | Réducteur à vis sans fin et engrenage hélicoidal | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 06.08.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 20.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4185514 (EDWARDS E DAVID) [X] 1,2,4 * column W * |