EP0890465 - Connecting device for arcs of accordion-coverings and covering including said device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Donà, Severino Via Galvani, 4 20090 Caleppio di Settala (MI) / IT | [2003/05] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states Donà, Severino Via Galvani, 2 20090 Caleppio di Settala (MI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830401.0 | 01.07.1998 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI01620 | 08.07.1997 Original published format: IT MI971620 | IT1997MI02792 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: IT MI972792 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0890465 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0890465 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890465 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/06 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
B60J7/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] |
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anschlussvorrichtung für Akkordeon-Abdeckungsbogen und Abdeckungen mit dieser Vorrichtung | [1999/02] | English: | Connecting device for arcs of accordion-coverings and covering including said device | [1999/02] | French: | Dispositif de raccordement pour arc de bâche-accordéon et bâche avec ce dispositif | [2002/27] |
Former [1999/02] | Dispositif de raccordment pour arc de bâche-accordéon et bâche avec ce dispositif | Examination procedure | 27.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 01.07.2003 | SE | 02.07.2003 | BE | 31.07.2003 | CH | 31.07.2003 | LI | 31.07.2003 | [2008/29] |
Former [2004/52] | SE | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 31.07.2003 | ||
CH | 31.07.2003 | ||
LI | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | SE | 02.07.2003 | |
CH | 31.07.2003 | ||
LI | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 02.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0140100 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 25 - line 33 * * page 2, line 21 - line 24 * * figures 1-4,10 *; | [A]FR2662652 (POMMIER & CIE [FR]) [A] 1,7,8,10 * page 4, line 6 - line 20 * * page 4, line 32 - line 35 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]DE29608103U (METALL SERVICE BRUEGGEN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,8,10 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 ** figures 3,5,6 *; | [XP]WO9732745 (NOMET MANAGEMENT SERV BV [NL], et al) [XP] 1-3,5,6 * page 5, line 5 - line 11 * * page 3, line 10 - line 11 * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 4 * * figures 1-3,8 *; | [E]DE19725812 (SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [E] 1-10 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 25 * * figures 1,3,4,8 * |