EP0978665 - Device for indicating lining wear in floating caliper disc brakes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freni Brembo S.p.A. Via Brembo, 25 24035 Curno (Bergamo) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Freni Brembo S.p.A. Via Brembo, 25 24035 Curno, Bergamo / IT | ||
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states Freni Brembo S.p.A. Via Brembo, 25 24035 Curno, Bergamo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciotti, Alessandro Via R. Sanzio, 5 24036 Ponte S. Pietro, Bergamo / IT | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/06] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830482.0 | 05.08.1998 | [2000/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978665 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978665 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/227, F16D66/02 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
F16D66/026 (EP,US);
F16D55/22655 (EP,US);
F16D55/227 (EP,US);
F16D66/025 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0008 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/42] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anzeigen des Belagverschleisses von Schwimmsattel-Scheibenbremsen | [2000/06] | English: | Device for indicating lining wear in floating caliper disc brakes | [2000/06] | French: | Dispositif indicateur d'usure de garnitures de frein à étrier coulissant | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 10.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5087907 (WEILER ROLF [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 42 - line 49 * * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 34; figures 1-3 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 33; figure 6 *; | [X]FR2716509 (ALLIEDSIGNAL AUTOMOTIVE ESPANA [ES]) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph L - page 4, line 6 * * page 5, paragraph L - page 6 * * figures 1-5,7 *; | [A]GB2029528 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 122 - page 2, line 101; figure - * |