EP0925976 - Guide for movable coverings and covering comprising said guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dona', Severino Via Luigi Galvani, 4 20090 Caleppio di Settala Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Dona', Severino Via Luigi Galvani, 2 20090 Caleppio di Settala, Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830563.7 | 25.09.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI02801 | 18.12.1997 Original published format: IT MI972801 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0925976 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0925976 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/06 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
B60J5/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2002/19] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Führung für bewegbare Abdeckungen und Abdeckung mit solcher Führung | [1999/26] | English: | Guide for movable coverings and covering comprising said guide | [1999/26] | French: | Guide pour couverture mobile et couverture pourvue d'un tel guide | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 17.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, SE | 01.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 14.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.2002 | 30.09.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4421280 (KRUPP AG HOESCH KRUPP [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 9 - column 3, line 20 * * abstract *; | [X]DE9404447U (TITGEMEYER GEB GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * page 6, paragraph 1 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0778169 (POMMIER & CIE [FR]) [A] 3 * column 3, line 17 - column 3, line 32 * * abstract *; | [DA]EP0621151 (DONA SEVERINO [IT]) [DA] 1,9 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 40 * * abstract * | by applicant | EP0621151 |