EP0979656 - Composition containing radioisotopes immobilised on solid particles, and its use in brachytherapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENEA - Ente per le Nuove Tecnologie, l'Energia e l'Ambiente Lungotevere Thaon di Revel, 76 00196 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states ENEA ENTE PER LE NUOVE TECNOLOGIE, L'ENERGIA E L'AMBIENTE Lungotevere Thaon di Revel, 76 00196 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states ENEA ENTE PER LE NUOVE TECNOLOGIE, L'ENERGIA E L'AMBIENTE Lungotevere Thaon di Revel, 76 00196 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sedda, Antioco Franco Via Odescalchi, 20 00062 Bracciano (RM) / IT | 02 /
Adamo, Mariana Via Isonzo, 5 00062 Bracciano (RM) / IT | 03 /
Rossi, Gabriele Via Carlo Alberto dalla Chiesa s.n.c. 00069 Trevignano Romano (RM) / IT | 04 /
Cipriani, Cesidio Via Cairoli, 8 00185 Roma / IT | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Banchetti, Marina, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Banchetti, Marina, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830776.5 | 23.12.1998 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | IT1998RM00303 | 11.05.1998 Original published format: IT RM980303 | [2000/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0979656 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0979656 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979656 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/12, A61P35/00 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
A61K51/1213 (EP);
A61K51/1241 (EP);
A61K51/1251 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/07] | A61K51/12, // A61K103:32, A61K103:00, A61K121:00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung enthaltend auf festen Teilchen immobilisierte Radioisotopen, sowie deren Verwendung in der Brachytherapie | [2000/07] | English: | Composition containing radioisotopes immobilised on solid particles, and its use in brachytherapy | [2000/07] | French: | Composition contenant des radioisotopes immobilisés sur des particules solides, et son utilisation en brachytherapie | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | GB | 23.12.2008 | IE | 23.12.2008 | LU | 23.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | FR | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/44] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CY | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 23.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 23.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 23.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 23.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 13.08.2008 | |
ES | 24.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06218276 ; | [Y]EP0030735 (THORELL JAN IVAN) [Y] 1-15 * example - *; | [YD]US5061475 (LIEBERMAN EPHRAIM [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * column 6, line 8 - line 16 *; | [Y]US5362473 (PANEK KAREL J [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * example 6 *; | [YD]WO9749335 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [YD] 1-15 * example - * * claim - *; | [YD] - MUMPER R J ET AL, "NEUTRON-ACTIVATED HOLMIUM-166-POLY (L-LACTIC ACID) MICROSPHERES: A POTENTIAL AGENT FOR THE INTERNAL RADIATION THERAPY OF HEPATIC TUMORS", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE. NEW YORK, US, (19911101), vol. 32, no. 11, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 2139 - 2143, XP000240389 [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941110), vol. 0185, no. 88, Database accession no. (C - 1271), & JP6218276 A 19940809 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - MARYANSKI M J ET AL, "RADIATION THERAPY DOSIMETRY USING MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING OF POLYMER GELS", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19960501), vol. 23, no. 5, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 699 - 705, XP000592654 [Y] 1-15 * page 700, paragraph II.A - paragraph II.B * * page 701, column R, paragraph F * * page 703, column R - page 704, column R, line 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.597717 | [Y] - AKUDUGU J M ET AL, "In vitro soft agar model for experimental brachytherapy: Absorbed dose measurements", ENDOCURIETHERAPY/HYPERTHERMIA ONCOLOGY 1996 UNITED STATES, (1996), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 8756-1689, pages 51 - 62, XP008013965 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 5-6B * * page 56, paragraph DISCUSSION - page 60 * |