EP0916851 - A pump impeller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2004 [2004/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc. 1105 North Market Street Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arbeus, Ulf Pyrolavägen 38 181 60 Lidingö / SE | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Larsson, Sten ITT FLYGT AB Box 1309 171 25 Solna / SE | [1999/20] | Application number, filing date | 98850157.3 | 14.10.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | SE19970004222 | 18.11.1997 Original published format: SE 9704222 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0916851 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0916851 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/24, F04D29/18 | [1999/20] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 09.11.1998 | LV | 09.11.1998 | RO | 09.11.1998 | SI | 09.11.1998 | Title | German: | Pumpenlaufrad | [1999/20] | English: | A pump impeller | [1999/20] | French: | Rouet de pompe | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 22.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 26.05.2003 | [2003/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1763595 (PAATSCH FRANK H) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 1, line 69 - page 2, line 59; figure - *; | [A]US3759628 (KEMPF D) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 6, line 11 - line 58; figures 2,10-12 *; | [A] - LINGMAN T, "THE DESIGN OF IMPELLER VANES FOR CENTRIFUGAL PUMPS", WORLD PUMPS, (19891101), no. 11, pages 392 - 396, XP000088102 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | SE375831 | US4347035 | SE435952 |