EP0867924 - Method for removing organic contaminants from a semiconductor surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2009/33] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICRO-ELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Heverlee / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Gendt, Stefan Ridder Gustaaf van Havre Laan 10 2110 Wijnegem / BE | 02 /
Snee, Peter Nekwinkelstraat 21/2 3001 Veltem-Beisem / BE | 03 /
Heyns, Marc Merelnest 14 3210 Linden / BE | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 98870026.6 | 10.02.1998 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | US19970040309P | 14.02.1997 Original published format: US 40309 P | US19970042389P | 25.03.1997 Original published format: US 42389 P | US19970066261P | 20.11.1997 Original published format: US 66261 P | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0867924 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0867924 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0867924 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/306, H01L21/311, G03F7/42 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
H01L21/31133 (EP,US);
G03F7/42 (EP,US);
G03F7/422 (EP,US);
G03F7/423 (EP,US);
H01L21/02063 (EP,US);
H01L21/31116 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/19] |
Former [1998/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung organischer Kontamination von einer Halbleiteroberfläche | [1998/40] | English: | Method for removing organic contaminants from a semiconductor surface | [1998/40] | French: | Procédé pour enlever la contamination organique de la surface de semiconducteurs | [1998/40] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | IT | 31.08.2011 | NL | 31.08.2011 | SE | 31.08.2011 | ES | 11.12.2011 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | [2013/22] |
Former [2012/49] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | NL | 31.08.2011 | |
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 31.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS614232 ; | [A]EP0327263 (PROCTOR PETER H) [A] 13 * page 10, line 51 - line 52 *; | [A]US4974530 (LYON RICHARD K [US]) [A] 1 * column 10, line 58 - line 59 *; | [DA]EP0548596 (CHLORINE ENG CORP LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,8,19,20,22,26 * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 10 *; | [X]GB2287827 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 7,9,10,12-14,16-18,22-24,26 * page 42, line 15 - page 50, line 20 *; | [XA]JPH07297163 (TOSHIBA ELETRONIC IWATE, et al) [X] 1,10,12,22,23,26 [A] 2,16-18,25; | [X]EP0702399 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 9,14,16-18,23,26 * the whole document *; | [DXA]US5503708 (KOIZUMI KOOTAROO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-3,10,12,13,26 * column 5, line 18 - column 7, line 14 * [A] 5; | US5632847 [ ] (OHNO REIKO [JP], et al) [ ] * the whole document *; | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860524), vol. 010, no. 141, Database accession no. (E - 406), & JP61004232 A 19860110 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [DA] 9,13-15,22,26 * abstract * | [DA] - SEHESTED K ET AL, "Decomposition of Ozone in Aqueous Acetic Acid Solutions (pH 0-4)", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 96, pages 1005 - 1009, XP002108237 [DA] 13-15 * section "Introduction" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/j100181a084 | Examination | - Hawley, Hawley's Condensed Chemical Dictionary, New York, Van Nostrand Reinhold Company, (1987), pages 1028 - 1028, ISBN 0442280971 |