EP0872391 - Security lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G-BLOCK S.A. Zoning Industriel de Ghislenghien, 16, Chemin Preuscamps 7822 Ghislenghien (ATH) / BE | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzalez-Navarro, Miguel rue de Graty, 15 7830 Hoves Silly / BE | 02 /
Gonzalez-Navarro, Santiago rue de Graty, 15 7830 Hoves Silly / BE | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Quintelier, Claude, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 98870083.7 | 15.04.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | BE19970000347 | 15.04.1997 Original published format: BE 9700347 | [1998/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0872391 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0872391 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/00, E05C19/18 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
B60R25/014 (EP);
E05C19/186 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/07] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sicherheitsschloss | [1998/43] | English: | Security lock | [1998/43] | French: | Serrure de sûreté | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/21] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1543397 (SCHROEDER CHARLES S) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [PX]US5644937 (FARINO JOSEPH [US]) [PX] 1,6 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 5; figures 5,11 *; | [X]FR2698904 (SECURTIR SA [LU]) [X] 1,4 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0681078 (WINNER INT [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 8, line 39 - column 9, line 7; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US4116297 (ROSS CURTIS R, et al) [A] 6 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9532109 |