EP0860109 - Prefabricated construction elements and construction assembled thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ebenseer Betonwerke AG Gusshausstrasse 6 1040 Wien / AT | [1998/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feike, Herbert Mitterweg 18 A-2486 Siegersdorf / AT | 02 /
Feike, Walter Leopold Figlgasse 3 A-2763 Piesting / AT | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Szász, Tibor Josef Elisabethallee 81/1/4 1130 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Szász, Tibor, Dipl.-Ing. Elisabethallee 81/1/4 1130 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 98890048.6 | 19.02.1998 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | AT19970000283 | 20.02.1997 Original published format: AT 28397 | [1998/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860109 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0860109 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01G1/08, E04H17/14, C05F17/02, E04H7/28 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
E04H7/28 (EP);
A01G9/28 (EP);
C05F17/907 (EP);
C05F17/964 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP);
Y02W30/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/39] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fertigteile für Bauwerke und Bauwerk hiervon | [1998/35] | English: | Prefabricated construction elements and construction assembled thereof | [1998/35] | French: | Eléments de construction préfabriqués et construction réalisée avec ceux-ci | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/22] | 13.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.09.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.09.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO7900567 (HANSEN B); | [A]EP0039448 (SF VOLLVERBUNDSTEIN [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 4, line 34 - page 6, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0075551 (SCHMARANZ RUDOLF [AT], et al) [A] 1,5 * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 23; figures 1-12 *; | [A]FR2575201 (BARGE ROLAND [FR]) [A] 1,6 * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2270934 (ROWLINSON TIMBER LTD [GB]) [A] 1,6,14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US1740011 | FR1109494 | DE1784862 | DD96622 | US4031678 | CA1180912 | DE3816066 | AT389729B | US5048250 | US5402609 |