EP0890652 - Wear resisting component made by metal melting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisenwerk Sulzau-Werfen, R. & E. Weinberger AG 5451 Tenneck / AT | [1999/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feistritzer, Bernhard, Dipl. Ing. Kohlplatzstrasse 23/4 5451 Tenneck / AT | 02 /
Schröder, Karl Heinrich, Dipl. Phys. Ing. 5522 St. Martin 167 / AT | 03 /
Windhager, Michael, Dr. 8933 St. Galien 163 / AT | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Wildhack, Helmut Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | [2009/31] |
Former [1999/02] | Wildhack, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Gerhard Jellinek, Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 98890195.5 | 03.07.1998 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | AT19970001185 | 10.07.1997 Original published format: AT 118597 | [1999/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0890652 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0890652 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/10 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
C22C1/1036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [2002/21] |
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | RO | 17.10.2001 | SI | 17.10.2001 | Title | German: | Bauteil aus einem verschleissfesten, schmelzmetallurgisch hergestellten Werkstoff | [1999/02] | English: | Wear resisting component made by metal melting | [1999/02] | French: | Composant résistant à l'usure, préparé par fusion de métal | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 25.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, GR, IE, MC, PT | 20.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/30] | 21.02.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.03.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3929471 (AKAHORI KIMIHIKO ET AL) [XD] 1-4,6,10,11,13 * abstract * * column 1, lines 62-68 * * column 2, line 49 - line 63 * * figures 2-5 * * column 5, line 12 - line 14 * * column 8, line 31 - line 33 *; | [X]US5246056 (LOMAX DONALD P ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-12,14 * claim - * * column 4, line 38 - line 51 * * table B *; | [X]US4399198 (LOMAX DONALD P ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-9,11,12,14 * abstract *; | [X]US4089466 (LOMAX DONALD P ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-13 * abstract * * column 2, lines 61-67 *; | [A]JPH0472034 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920622), vol. 016, no. 277, Database accession no. (C - 0954), & JP04072034 A 19920306 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 7-9 * abstract * |