EP0922279 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EXECUTING A HUMAN-MACHINE DIALOGUE IN THE FORM OF TWO-SIDED SPEECH AS BASED ON A MODULAR DIALOGUE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scansoft, Inc. 9 Centennial Drive Peabody, MA 01960 / US | [2003/29] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÖDE, Holger, Werner Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SCHROER, Olaf Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
MARSCHNER, Jens, Friedemann Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
AUST, Harald Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
MARTI DEL OLMO, Enrique Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1999/24] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98900005.4 | 07.01.1998 | [1999/24] | WO1998IB00006 | Priority number, date | EP19970200050 | 09.01.1997 Original published format: EP 97200050 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9831007 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0922279 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G10L7/08, G10L5/02 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
G10L15/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES AUF EINER MODULAREN STRUKTURBASIERTEN MENSCH-MASCHINE-DIALOG IN DER FORM BEIDSEITIGER SPRACHE | [1999/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EXECUTING A HUMAN-MACHINE DIALOGUE IN THE FORM OF TWO-SIDED SPEECH AS BASED ON A MODULAR DIALOGUE STRUCTURE | [1999/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR EXECUTER UN DIALOGUE HOMME-MACHINE SOUS LA FORME D'UN DISCOURS BILATERAL SUR LA BASE D'UNE STRUCTURE DE DIALOGUE MODULAIRE | [1999/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/44] | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2004 | 31.01.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0175503 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]); | [A]US5621891 (RUEHL HANS WILHELM [NL], et al) | [X] - TELECOM. TECHNOL., Volume 1, No. 1, July 1983, J.A. WATERWORTH, "Man-Machine Speech 'Dialogue Acts'". |