EP0889094 - FLAME-RETARDANT RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihonmmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Mioko, Teijin Ltd., Chiba Research Center 4-13, Oonodai 1-chome, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 267 / JP | 02 /
SAIKI, Noritsugu, Teijin Ltd., Tokyo Res. Center 3-2, Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1999/01] | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98900049.2 | 06.01.1998 | [1999/01] | WO1998JP00013 | Priority number, date | JP19970003021 | 10.01.1997 Original published format: JP 302197 | [1999/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9830632 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889094 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889094 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08K9/04, // (C08L67/02, 61:10) | [1999/01] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/22 (KR);
C08K3/32 (KR);
C08K9/08 (KR);
C08L61/04 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L61/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1999/01] | Title | German: | FEUERHEMMENDE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1999/01] | English: | FLAME-RETARDANT RESIN COMPOSITION | [1999/01] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE IGNIFUGE | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1998 | Translation filed | 16.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 16.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 11.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS4537125B ; | [Y]JPS528062 (RHONE POULENC IND); | [Y]JPS52112651 (RHONE POULENC IND); | [Y]JPS5394357 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPS5439200B ; | [A]JPS58108248 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPS58196259 (BASF AG); | [A]JPS58198559 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPS598736 (KANEBO LTD, et al); | [A]JPS5924752 (KANEBO LTD, et al); | [A]JPS5981351 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPS61111342 (NIPPON CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPS63110254 (PHOSPHORUS CHEM IND); | [Y]JPS63156860 (NIPPON CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPH08208884 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) |