EP0903832 - GENERATOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [2006/51] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | ||
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | ||
For all designated states Arai, Hideaki Kabushikigaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
For all designated states Kubo, Kazuyuki Kabushikigaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
For all designated states Kuroda, Seiichi Kabushikigaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
For all designated states Fujiwara, Tadashi Kabushikigaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
For all designated states Nagano, Shinsuke Kabushikigaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
For all designated states Fujita, Takuya Kabushikigaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI, Hideaki, Kabushi Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
KUBO, Kazuyuki, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
KURODA, Seiichi, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
FUJIWARA, Tadashi, Kabushi.Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
NAGANO, Shinsuke, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 06 /
FUJITA, Takuya, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/49] | 01 /
ARAI, Hideaki, Kabushi Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | ||
02 /
KUBO, Kazuyuki, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
KURODA, Seiichi, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
04 /
FUJIWARA, Tadashi, Kabushi.Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
05 /
NAGANO, Shinsuke, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
06 /
FUJITA, Takuya, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
Former [1999/12] | 01 /
ARAI, Hideaki-Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | ||
02 /
KUBO, Kazuyuki, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
03 /
KURODA, Seiichi, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
04 /
FUJIWARA, Tadashi, Kabushi.Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
05 /
NAGANO, Shinsuke, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | |||
06 /
FUJITA, Takuya, Kabushi. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98900221.7 | 13.01.1998 | [1999/12] | WO1998JP00085 | Priority number, date | JP19970015859 | 13.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1585997 | JP19970015860 | 13.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1586097 | [1999/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831089 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0903832 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/12] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0903832 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903832 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/16, H02P9/30, F02D29/06, H02K19/26, H02P9/48 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
H02K19/26 (EP,US);
H02P9/30 (EP,US);
H02P9/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/12] | H02J7/16, H02P9/30, F02D29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/12] | Title | German: | LICHTMASCHINE FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [1999/12] | English: | GENERATOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1999/12] | French: | GENERATEUR POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1999/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.1998 | Translation filed | 10.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 10.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.12.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | FR | 10.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH01277650 ; | [DA]JPH05180047 ; | [X]EP0357183 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract *; | [A]US5418446 (HALLIDY WILLIAM M [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0665637 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,13 * abstract * [A] 3,5,6,8,10-12; | [PX]EP0817367 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900129), vol. 014, no. 049, Database accession no. (M - 0927), & JP01277650 A 19891108 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931108), vol. 017, no. 604, Database accession no. (M - 1506), & JP05180047 A 19930720 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH0287999 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [Y]JPH06113479 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [X]JPH07255200 (NIPPON DENSO CO) |