EP0960453 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR WITH SHUNT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAMART, Olivier 12, rue Victor Hugo F-95440 Ecouen / FR | 02 /
LALANGE, Jacques 9, rue du Mouton F-95300 Pontoise / FR | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach (SG) / CH | Application number, filing date | 98900337.1 | 28.01.1998 | [1999/48] | WO1998IB00104 | Priority number, date | EP19970400300 | 11.02.1997 Original published format: EP 97400300 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9835407 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0960453 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0960453 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/70 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
H01R13/7032 (EP,US);
H01R13/4361 (EP,US);
H01R13/7031 (EP,US);
H01R31/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/48] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER MIT KURZSCHLUSSBRÜCKE | [1999/48] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR WITH SHUNT | [1999/48] | French: | CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE A DERIVATION | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0678938 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1-5,8,9 * column 4, line 17 - line 43 * * column 6, line 3 - column 7, line 7 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB2245775 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1-5,8,9 * page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 4 * * page 6, line 34 - page 8, line 2 * * figures 4-8 * |