EP1019099 - COMPOSITIONS FOR ELIMINATING HUMAN AND ANIMAL EXCREMENT SMELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Damar Holdings S.A. c/o Knowles, McKay & Miller, 43 Elizabeth Avenue, P.O. Box 8680, Nassau / BS | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVI, Shalom Hacotel Hamaaravi Street 21/4 84280 Beer Sheva / IL | 02 /
DAREN, Steve Hapartizanim Street 10 70400 Nes Ziona / IL | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98900347.0 | 14.01.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998IL00016 | Priority number, date | IL19970120007 | 14.01.1997 Original published format: IL 12000797 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9830251 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019099 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019099 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/01, A61L11/00, A01K1/015 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
A01K1/0152 (EP,US);
A61L11/00 (EP,US);
A61L2/18 (EP,US);
A61L9/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON GERÜCHEN AUS MENSCHLICHEN UND TIERISCHEN EXKREMENTEN | [2002/32] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR ELIMINATING HUMAN AND ANIMAL EXCREMENT SMELLS | [2000/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR ELIMINER LES ODEURS DES EXCREMENTS HUMAINS ET ANIMAUX | [2000/29] |
Former [2000/29] | MITTEL ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON GERÜCHEN AUS MENSCHLICHEN UND TIERISCHEN EXKREMENTEN | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 31.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.12.2002 | FI | 11.12.2002 | GR | 11.12.2002 | LI | 11.12.2002 | LU | 14.01.2003 | MC | 31.01.2003 | PT | 11.03.2003 | SE | 11.03.2003 | [2013/51] |
Former [2005/02] | CH | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
LU | 14.01.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | CH | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
LU | 14.01.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 11.12.2002 | |
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | CH | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 11.12.2002 | |
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 11.03.2003 | |
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 11.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6238285 ; | [A]JPH06165815 ; | [A]JPS61232855 ; | [A]JPS61137565 ; | [A]JPS5749456 ; | [Y]WO8102891 (UNISCOPE INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * examples 1-3; claim - *; | [X]EP0354281 (AIKOH CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 2 - line 22; example .; claim - *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 13, Database accession no. 87-089438, XP002067350 & JPS6238285 A 00000000 (RELEASE KAGAKU KOGY) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 28, Database accession no. 94-230251, XP002067351 & JPH06165815 A 00000000 (MATSUKAWA N) [A] 1-18 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 48, Database accession no. 86-315230, XP002067352 & JPS61232855 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI OIL CO) [A] 1-18 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 32, Database accession no. 86-207005, XP002067353 & JPS61137565 A 00000000 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEM MFG) [A] 1-18 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 17, Database accession no. 82-34387E, XP002067354 & JPS5749456 A 00000000 (HITACHI KIDEN KOGYO KK) [A] * abstract * | Examination | - ENCYCLOPEDIA OF POLYMER SCIENCE AND ENGINNERING, JOHN WILEY | - FUNDAMENTAL PRINCIPLES OF POLYMERIC MATERIALS, JOHN WILEY |