EP0895980 - 3-HYDROXYMETHYLCYCLOALKANOLS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Kenichi 2-76, Ebisu-cho,Otsu-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-11 / JP | 02 /
MATSUOKA, Kazuyuki 3-4-16, Yoneyamadai,Kanmaki-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 639-02 / JP | 03 /
YAGIHARA, Hiroshi 1177-5, Matogata,Matogata-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-01 / JP | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98900435.3 | 20.01.1998 | [1999/06] | WO1998JP00191 | Priority number, date | JP19970011066 | 24.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1106697 | [1999/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9832723 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895980 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C35/02, C07C35/08, C07C29/17, C07C29/143, C07C29/14, C07C45/33, C07C45/34, C07C29/136 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
C07C49/757 (EP,US);
C07C29/145 (EP,US);
C07C35/02 (EP,US);
C07C35/08 (EP,US);
C07C45/33 (EP,US);
C07C45/34 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/145, C07C35/08 (EP,US);
C07C45/33, C07C49/523 (US,EP);
C07C45/34, C07C49/757 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/06] | C07C35/02, C07C35/08, C07C29/136, C07C29/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/06] | Title | German: | 3-HYDROXYMETHYLCYCLOALKANONE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1999/06] | English: | 3-HYDROXYMETHYLCYCLOALKANOLS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM | [1999/06] | French: | 3-HYDROXYMETHYLCYCLOALCANOLS ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1999/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1998 | Translation filed | 17.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 17.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/06] | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/25] | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JPH10158209 ; | [X] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme Gmbh,, XP002119457 [X] 1-3 * see BRN=1921242 * | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON, (1977), vol. 33, pages 2513 - 2519 | [X] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme Gmbh,, XP002119458 [X] 1,2 * see BRN=2070337 * | [ ] - J. CHEM. SOC. PERJIN TRANS. 1, (1974), pages 1243 - 1245 | [X] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme Gmbh,, XP002119459 [X] 1,2 * see BRN=2551760 * | [ ] - J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1980), vol. 102, no. 22, pages 6736 - 6744 | [X] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme Gmbh,, XP002119460 [X] 1,2 * see BRN=6186882 * | [ ] - J. ORG. CHEM., (1981), vol. 46, no. 24, pages 4880 - 4885 | [X] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme Gmbh,, XP002119461 [X] 1,2 * see BRN=1921275 * | [ ] - J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1971), vol. 93, pages 2821 - 2823 | [X] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme Gmbh,, XP002119462 [X] 1,2 * see BRN=6565138 * | [ ] - HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1983), vol. 66, no. 4, pages 1090 - 1100 | [X] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme Gmbh,, XP002119463 [X] 1,2 * see BRN=6777780 * | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON, (1965), vol. 21, pages 3273 - 3276 | [X] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme Gmbh,, XP002119464 [X] 1,2 * see BRN=3125840 * | [ ] - J. CHEM. SOC., (1959), pages 3289 - 3299 | [X] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme Gmbh,, XP002119465 [X] 1 * see BRN=6897750 * | [ ] - J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1976), vol. 98, pages 5937 - 5968 | [X] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme Gmbh,, XP002119466 [X] 1 * see BRN=6496202 * | [ ] - CHEM. BER., (1988), vol. 121, pages 1013 - 1016 | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10158209 A 19980616 (DAICEL CHEM IND LTD) [E] 6 * abstract * | International search | [X] - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1983), Vol. 105, DAVID B. COLLUM et al., "Mercury (11)-Mediated Opening of Cyclopropanes", pages 6882-6889. | [X] - PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1994), Vol. 35, No. 6, HIRONOBU TAKAHASHI et al., "Biotransformation of (-)- and (+)-Neomenthols and Isomenthol by Aspergillus Niger", pages 1465-1467. | [X] - CHEM. BER., (1988), Vol. 121, WOLFGANG KIRMSE et al., "Zerfall von 2-Oxa-5- und -6-Norbornandiazonium-Ionen", pages 485-492. |