EP0961438 - AUTHENTICATION SYSTEM, AUTHENTICATION DEVICE, AUTHENTICATION DATA PRODUCING DEVICE, AND AUTHENTICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIKITA, Junichi, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | 02 /
IKEFUJI, Yoshihiro, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | 03 /
CHIMURA, Shigemi, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98901081.4 | 30.01.1998 | [1999/48] | WO1998JP00414 | Priority number, date | JP19970029182 | 13.02.1997 Original published format: JP 2918297 | [1999/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836527 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961438 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961438 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L9/16, H04M15/00, H04M17/02 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
H04L9/3234 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1999/48] | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSSYSTEM, AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSDATEN UND AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [1999/48] | English: | AUTHENTICATION SYSTEM, AUTHENTICATION DEVICE, AUTHENTICATION DATA PRODUCING DEVICE, AND AUTHENTICATION METHOD | [1999/48] | French: | SYSTEME D'AUTHENTIFICATION, DISPOSITIF D'AUTHENTIFICATION, DISPOSITIF PRODUISANT DES DONNEES D'AUTHENTIFICATION, ET PROCEDE D'AUTHENTIFICATION | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.1999 | Translation filed | 11.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 11.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 11.08.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9202087 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 21, line 35 - page 25, line 8; figure 5 *; | [X]EP0266044 (COMPUTREX CENTRES LTD [CA]) [X] 1-13 * page 3, line 10 - line 14 * | International search | [X]US5325434 (SPAANDERMAN JURGEN J [NL], et al); | [X]JPS60220636 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]JPS62118472 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPS63301664 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [A]JPS564969 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | [Y] - IEICE, 20 May 1989, 3rd Edition, SHINICHI IKENO, KENJI OYAMA, "Modern Cryptography Theory (in Japanese)", pages 66-67. |